Anandakrishnan, Canagasundram (CPSO#: 56241)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015