Ananth, Shobana (CPSO#: 71608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shobana Ananth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ananth ( CPSO# 71608 )

Business Address:
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHOBANA ANANTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANANTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999