Anantha, Ram Venkatesh (CPSO#: 93402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tamil

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wake Forest Baptist Medical Center
1 Medical Center Boulevard
Winston-Salem, NC 27157
USA
Winston-Salem NC  27157
United States
Phone: 3367162011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAM VENKATESH ANANTHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANANTHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2016