Ananthanarayan, Chidambaram Rushinarada (CPSO#: 42361)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Bangalore University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009