Anastakis, Dimitrios John (CPSO#: 59770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 2-East Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5790
Fax: (416) 603-6189
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dimitri J. Anastakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Anastakis ( CPSO# 59770 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
2nd Floor, East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5790

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIMITRIOS JOHN ANASTAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANASTAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1989