Andeejani, Ahmed Mohammed Ibrahim (CPSO#: 72873)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic

Education:King Faisal University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andeejani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2004

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004