Andermann, Lisa Francesca Simone (CPSO#: 70267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue 9th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4514
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA FRANCESCA SIMONE ANDERMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERMANN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001