Andersen, Laura Leigh Lise (CPSO#: 98890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 ANDREW STREET
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: 519-804-9234
Fax: 519-804-2604
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Andersen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2016


Corporation Name: Laura Andersen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Andersen ( CPSO# 98890 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA LEIGH LISE ANDERSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 14 Jan 2014 to 02 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 03 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015