Andersen, Lee Kelly (CPSO#: 77530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mill Creek Care Centre
286 Hurst Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 0Z3
Phone: (705) 719-6222
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boushy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boushy ( CPSO# 70462 )
Dr. L. Andersen ( CPSO# 77530 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
70 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 722-9191

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE KELLY ANDERSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004