Andersen-Kay, Michelle Louise (CPSO#: 71229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit #3, 729 Devonshire Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 5R3
Phone: (519) 533-1444
Fax: (519) 533-0499
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Woodtock General Hospital
310 Julianna Dr,
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Andersen-Kay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Andersen-Kay ( CPSO# 71229 )

Business Address:
729 Devonshire Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 5R3
Phone Number: (519) 533-1444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LOUISE ANDERSEN-KAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSEN-KAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1999 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2000