Anderson, Alvin James (CPSO#: 14547)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alvin Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2014

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical records may send a request by fax to: 416-593-5902.
Date Received: 19 Jan 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1954
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Sep 2000
Summary:

On September 19, 2000, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Anderson guilty of professional 
misconduct for failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession particularly in 
respect of repeat prescriptions of drugs.  The Committee found Dr. Anderson not guilty of the 
remaining allegations against him. 

On January 29, 2001 the Discipline Committee ordered the following: 

Dr. Anderson be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the Register. 

Dr. Anderson’s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of six months, to become 
effective February 1, 2001, all of which will be suspended if Dr. Anderson fulfills the following 
six conditions: 

  -  In the event Dr. Anderson breaches or fails to fulfill any one of the forgoing conditions, 
     all of the suspension shall immediately become effective from the date the Registrar is 
     notified of a breach of the conditions 
   -  that he undergo PREP tailored to his medical practice (excluding paediatrics and 
      obstetrics) at his own expense and abide by any of its restrictions or recommendations; 
   -  that he undergo a medical record-keeping course at his own expense and abide by any 
      recommendations of that course; 
   -  that he maintain a narcotics dispensing log in respect of any and all narcotic 
      prescriptions; 
   -  that he abide by the Alberta Guidelines on narcotic prescribing; 
   -  that he submit to a Quality Assurance Assessment one year after completing the narcotics 
      prescribing and medical record-keeping courses; 
   -  that he pay the College costs fixed at $1,000. on or before February 28, 2001. 

At the hearing, Dr. Anderson through his counsel, undertook not to prescribe narcotics in his 
general practice including, Seconal, Percocet, Percodan, or Talwin and only to prescribe such 
drugs in connection with his surgical practice for a limited duration following surgery.  The 
Committee accepts that undertaking and expects Dr. Anderson to abide by it. 

On September 25, 2002, the Divisional Court, on reading the consent of the parties, filed, 
ordered that Dr. Anderson's appeal, of the decision and reasons of the Discipline Committee 
dated September 19, 2000 and the oral decision and reasons of January 29, 2001, be allowed and 
that the finding of professional misconduct made by the Discipline Committee be set aside. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 25 Sep 2002
Hearing Date(s): 05 Oct 1999


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Aug 1985
Summary:

 In August 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Anderson guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Anderson's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three 
 months.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 22 Jan 1987
Hearing Date(s): 19 Aug 1985

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On October 29, 2013, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Anderson.