Anderson, Andrew Robert (CPSO#: 60464)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1990