Anderson, Ian Bruce (CPSO#: 33184)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002