Anderson, Ian (CPSO#: 24218)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 22 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016