Anderson, Jennifer Ann (CPSO#: 58324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
8-163 Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5278
Fax: (416) 864-5367
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Anderson ( CPSO# 58324 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
8-163 Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5278

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988