Anderson, Paul William (CPSO#: 56715)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 27 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2015