Anderson, Rachel Sheila (CPSO#: 98548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Gottschalk, Rachel Sheila (used until: 15 Jul 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milverton and District Medical
Centre
Suite 101
50 William Street
Milverton ON  N0K 1M0
Phone: (519) 595-8548
Fax: (519) 595-8856
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stratford Family Health Team
444 Douro St
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Canada
Phone: (519) 273-7017
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Anderson ( CPSO# 98548 )

Business Address:
Milverton and District Medical Centre
101-50 William Street
Milverton ON  N0K 1M0
Phone Number: (519) 595-8548

Business Address:
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL SHEILA ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 03 Oct 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 04 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014