Anderson, Ralph Joseph (CPSO#: 19686)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Dec 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2013