Andolfatto, Gary (CPSO#: 62284)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 1998