Andrade Banuelos, Andrea Valeria (CPSO#: 96806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Center
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 56314
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Andrea Valeria Andrade Banuelos may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Andrade
                        Banuelos holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Andrade Banuelos  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Andrade Banuelos'
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Andrade Banuelos'
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 25, 2015, and expires on June 30,
                  2018.  Upon renewal of Dr. Andrade Banuelos' academic appointment at the
                  University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
                  to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.