Andrade, Danielle Molinari De (CPSO#: 81786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 23 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Federal University of Parana, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurology
West Wing 5 445
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5927
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE MOLINARI DE ANDRADE may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. ANDRADE holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. ANDRADE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ANDRADE no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. ANDRADE no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. ANDRADE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2004 to 27 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 17 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016