Andrawes, Maged Samir Mettry (CPSO#: 100206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maged Andrawes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Andrawes ( CPSO# 100206)

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue
Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGED SAMIR METTRY ANDRAWES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRAWES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017