Andrawis, Mamdouh Nabil Riad (CPSO#: 78653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Dundas Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 1Z7
Phone: (613) 354-3960
Fax: (613) 354-8077
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Andrawis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Andrawis ( CPSO# 78653 )

Business Address:
89 Dundas Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 1Z7
Phone Number: (613) 354-3960

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAMDOUH NABIL RIAD ANDRAWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRAWIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2003 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History