Andrejicka, Stefan Emil (CPSO#: 31430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: Andrejicka, Stephen Emil (used until: 24 Jan 2016 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Phone: (519) 661-9675
Fax: (416) 901-7217
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

808 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6A 3W4
Canada
Phone: 519-661-9675
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stefan Andrejicka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Andrejicka ( CPSO# 31430 )

Business Address:
692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 901-9020

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEFAN EMIL ANDREJICKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREJICKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012