Andreou, Efrosini Roseann (CPSO#: 76044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Hematology Oncology Clinic
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6410
Fax: (416) 469-6420
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andreou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Andreou ( CPSO# 76044 )

Business Address:
Hematology Oncology Clinic
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EFROSINI ROSEANN ANDREOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2006