Andrews, Catriona Helen (CPSO#: 61949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: Drosdowech, Catriona Helen (used until: 09 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATRIONA HELEN ANDREWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREWS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1991