Andrews, Hilary Anne (CPSO#: 26932)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Birmingham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Apr 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995