Andrews, John William Henry (CPSO#: 22437)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1963
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 31 Mar 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994