Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Andrighetti, Santina (CPSO#: 65168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite475
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M4J2
Phone: (905) 815-8885
Fax: (905) 815-8560
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrighetti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Andrighetti ( CPSO# 65168 )

Business Address:
475 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 815-8885

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANTINA ANDRIGHETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRIGHETTI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993