Andrus, Catherine Lynn (CPSO#: 88324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 571-0822
Fax: (519) 571-1210
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Andrus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Andrus ( CPSO# 88324 )

Business Address:
Unit 207
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 571-0822

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE LYNN ANDRUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013