Andrus, Paul Guy Lonsdale (CPSO#: 66961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medica One
Third Floor
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 662-9128
Fax: (905) 592-2325
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Andrus ( CPSO# 66961 )

Business Address:
Medica One
Third Floor
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 304-8573

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jan 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL GUY LONSDALE ANDRUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Apr 1997
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 May 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Apr 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2000