Anello, Francesco (CPSO#: 50083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Laurel Street
Cambridge ON  N3H 3Y7
Phone: (519) 653-3731
Fax: (519) 653-3736
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 7, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Francesco Anello, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Anello to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. FRANCESCO ANELLO
                                          ("Dr. Anello")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:
                  
                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Anello, certificate of registration number 50083, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Anello, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214726 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family practice
                  and/or my complementary medicine practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Anello, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Anello, undertake that, effective immediately, I will
                        require that all current patients have a family physician or
                        certified specialist who will provide concurrent care.  
                  
            (6)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Anello, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post
                        a sign in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a
                        clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "A."  For further clarity, this sign shall state as
                        follows: 
                  
                        "I require that all of my current patients have a family physician
                        or certified specialist who will provide concurrent care. 
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Anello, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (6)(a) in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations,
                        in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "A." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Anello, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Anello, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Anello, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (6)(d).
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Anello, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Anello, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Anello, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Anello, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Anello, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Anello, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Anello, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Anello, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Anello, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Anello, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                  Dr. Anello was the subject of a College investigation into whether he
                  engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his family
                  practice and/or his complementary medicine practice.  
                  
                  As a result of the investigation, Dr. Anello has agreed that he will
                  require that all current patients have a family physician or certified
                  specialist who will provide concurrent care.  
                  
                  Dr. Anello shall also post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of
                  all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:
                  
                  "I require that all of my current patients have a family physician or
                  certified specialist who will provide concurrent care. 
                  Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                  Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Anello, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Francesco Anello to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 7, 2017:

Dr. Anello was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his family practice and/or his complementary medicine practice.

As a result of the investigation, Dr. Anello has agreed that he will require that all current patients have a family physician or certified specialist who will provide concurrent care.

Dr. Anello shall also post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

“I require that all of my current patients have a family physician or certified specialist who will provide concurrent care.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.