Ang, Lee Cyn (CPSO#: 54937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Univ of Singapore, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology & Lab Med
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32289
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 08 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE CYN ANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1989