Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ang, Vivienne (CPSO#: 60794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
553 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 1A3
Phone: (416) 652-3307
Fax: (416) 652-3413
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chan Ang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ang ( CPSO# 60794 )
Dr. E. Chan ( CPSO# 60785 )

Business Address:
553 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 652-3307

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIENNE ANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990