Angarita Celis, Fernando Andres (CPSO#: 106371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of General Surgery
Wing 3 071
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5422
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Colombia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FERNANDO ANDRES ANGARITA CELIS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ANGARITA CELIS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ANGARITA CELIS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ANGARITA CELIS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ANGARITA CELIS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ANGARITA CELIS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ANGARITA CELIS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018