Angeles, Maria Carmen Manaloto (CPSO#: 81358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
P O Box 2030
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: 5193526400 Ext. 6081
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Angeles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Angeles ( CPSO# 81358 )

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA CARMEN MANALOTO ANGELES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANGELES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 06 Aug 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 07 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010