Angell, Walter Frederick (CPSO#: 20794)

Current Status: Revoked: Fitness to Practise Committee as of 08 Apr 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Apr 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1999
Revoked: Fitness to Practice Committee. Effective: 08 Apr 1999

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 08 Apr 1999
Summary:

 In April 1999, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Angell to be incapacitated.  
 Subsequently, the Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. Angell(s certificate of 
 registration.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Apr 1999