Angelov, Lilyana (CPSO#: 65447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, French, Macedonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cleveland Clinic
9500 Euclid Avenue
CA5-093
Cleveland OH  44195
United States
Phone: (216) 444-4253
Fax: (216) 444-0924

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILYANA ANGELOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANGELOV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
Resident 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993