Angle, Pamela Jean (CPSO#: 61443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sun nybrook Health Sciences Ctr
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 85054
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pamela Angle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Angle ( CPSO# 61443 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Obstetrical Anesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M5 318E
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA JEAN ANGLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANGLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jun 1991