Anglin, Peter James (CPSO#: 57238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Anglin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Anglin ( CPSO# 57238 )

Business Address:
Stronarch Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JAMES ANGLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANGLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1987