Anglin, Rebecca Elizabeth Shirley (CPSO#: 82525)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fiona Stanley Hospital
11 Robin Warren Drive
Murdoch 6150
Australia
Phone: 0401539400
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Anglin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster University Medical Centre Medical Records and GI Division 1200 Main Street West Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017