Anifowoshe, Akeem Babatunde (CPSO#: 83096)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Nov 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Illinois, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akeem Anifowoshe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 16 2015

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 04 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 2014

Concerns

Source: Registration Department
Active Date: November 12, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary:

Dr. Akeem Babatunde ANIFOWOSHE is not a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and is no longer registered with the College. An investigation has confirmed that Dr. ANIFOWOSHE obtained his certificate of registration by making false or misleading representations and declarations on or in connection with his application for a certificate of registration, by commission or omission, and is deemed thereafter not to have, and not to have had, the standards and qualifications for a certificate of any class, pursuant to the Medicine Act, 1991, O.Reg.865/93, s.2(4)