Aniol, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 64063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B1
1276 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone: (705) 525-2171
Fax: (705) 525-2173
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Aniol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aniol ( CPSO# 64063 )

Business Address:
B1 - 1276 LaSalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone Number: (705) 525-2171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH ANIOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANIOL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1991 to 14 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992