Anki Chetty, Saravanan Periyanahalli (CPSO#: 92686)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mysore University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2010 to 15 Jun 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2013