Annamalai, Ganesan (CPSO#: 85750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Tamil

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Depart. of Medical Imaging, Rm 568
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4666
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Annamalai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sandhu ( CPSO# 85770 )
Dr. G. Annamalai ( CPSO# 85750 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 568
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Nov 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Ganesan  Annamalai  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  diagnostic
            radiology, only.