Annich, Gail Mary (CPSO#: 60193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-4918
Fax: 416-813-7299
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAIL MARY ANNICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANNICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2014