Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Annis, Robert William Frank (CPSO#: 59933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Annis ( CPSO# 59933 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200


Corporation Name: Dr. Terry Suggitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Matthews ( CPSO# 58936 )
Dr. R. Latuskie ( CPSO# 66312 )
Dr. G. Edmonds ( CPSO# 76383 )
Dr. R. Annis ( CPSO# 59933 )
Dr. L. Hayward ( CPSO# 95251 )
Dr. D. Gateman ( CPSO# 100625)
Dr. R. Warren ( CPSO# 52853 )
Dr. T. Suggitt ( CPSO# 77060 )
Dr. P. Rutherford ( CPSO# 19820 )
Dr. A. Qureshi ( CPSO# 58128 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT WILLIAM FRANK ANNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANNIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989