Annisette, Garth Kevin Martin (CPSO#: 50085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
410 Giles Boulevard East
Windsor ON  N9A 4C6
Phone: (519) 256-3626
Fax: (519) 254-3849
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3615 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3S6
Canada
Phone: (519) 969-2854
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Garth Annisette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Annisette ( CPSO# 50085 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Site
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Business Address:
410 Giles Boulevard East
Windsor ON  N9A 4C6
Phone Number: (519) 256-3626

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARTH KEVIN MARTIN ANNISETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANNISETTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1984