Annisette, Spencer William (CPSO#: 105052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1303 County Road 22
Lakeshore ON  N0R 1A0
Phone: (226) 363-0930
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SPENCER WILLIAM ANNISETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANNISETTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2016 to 14 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017