Ansari, Imran (CPSO#: 83594)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tribhuvan University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2005 to 16 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 17 Sep 2005 to 25 Oct 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2005